Lo, Anne On Yee (CPSO#: 68140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 497-9868
Fax: (416) 298-9849
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lo ( CPSO# 68140 )

Business Address:
207 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 298-3883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ON YEE LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1996