Lo, Benjamin Wai Yue (CPSO#: 79116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French, Japanese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
288 Macedonia Crescent
Mississauga ON  L5B 3J8
Phone: (514) 398-6644
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN WAI YUE LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009