Lo, Dorothy Sue (CPSO#: 77956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dorothy S. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lo ( CPSO# 77956 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
6th Floor-East Wing
Room 118
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6235

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTHY SUE LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006