Lo, Eddie Sun-Yee (CPSO#: 22898)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eddie Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Mar 2015