Lo, Edmond Kai-Wai (CPSO#: 47681)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edmond Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2016