Lo, Gregory Kwong-Kan (CPSO#: 76173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RS McLaughlin Durham Regional
Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lo ( CPSO# 76173 )

Business Address:
R. S. McLaughlin Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Room 2C169 - 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY KWONG-KAN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005