Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lo, Hanson King-Chiu (CPSO#: 64259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
320 Byron Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone: (905) 668-5835
Fax: (905) 668-8942
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanson Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lo ( CPSO# 64259 )

Business Address:
320 Byron Street South
Suite 200
Whitby ON  L1N 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 668-5835

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANSON KING-CHIU LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1992