Lo, Hung-Tat (CPSO#: 29724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Mar 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 409
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 297-4807
Fax: (416) 297-8478
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hong Fook Mental Health
Association
130 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M5T 2E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4242
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Across Boundaries Mental
Health Centre
51 Clarkson Avenue
Toronto ON  M6E 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-3007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hung Tat Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lo ( CPSO# 29724 )

Business Address:
409 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 297-4807

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 03 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 3, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Hung-Tat Lo, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lo to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                            DR. HUNG-TAT LO
                                              ("Dr. Lo")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lo, certificate of registration number 29724, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking from
                  the date on which I sign it.

            (4)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"),
                        attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            (5)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the IEP set out in section (4) above and Appendix "A"
                        attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment
                        may include a chart review, direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by the
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be
                        provided to me and reported to the College and the report may form
                        the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lo, hereby consent to any recommendations of the Assessor(s)
                        which are terms, conditions or limitations on my practice being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code.

            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge that
                  a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act
                  of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a
                  referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Lo was the subject of an assessment of his practice. As a
                        result of the assessment, Dr. Lo's practice will be reassessed by
                        an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the
                        completion of the Individualized Education Plan.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (4) above and to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to any Assessor(s) to disclose to
                  the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (d)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of the
                        Reassessment and which he or she reasonably believes indicates a
                        potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jan 2012
Summary:

On January 13, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hung-Tat Lo committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
Record-keeping 
 
Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to Patient A. The 
patient's record was largely illegible and most entries contained scant information. Changes to 
medications were made at the last three appointments without documented communication with 
Patient A's family doctor, who was managing the patient's medications on a more consistent 
basis. Risk assessments and their conclusions were not documented.  
 
Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard of practice in record-keeping with respect to fourteen 
of fifteen patients. Patient records were largely illegible and transcriptions were required for 
review. The patient encounter entries were generally scant. Most charts did not have the initial 
history, diagnosis and treatment plan charted in any detail. There was a general lack of pertinent 
negative findings, and mental status exams and risk assessments were not documented. 
    
Care and Treatment 
 
Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice in his care and treatment of Patient A with 
respect to his collateral fact gathering and follow-up. Dr. Lo also failed to maintain the standard 
of practice in his care and treatment of two patients, in that he: 1) failed to adequately monitor 
the Lithium level of one patient and failed to make the necessary inquires that would have led to 
the disclosure of the patient's thyroid carcinoma; and 2) managed an alcoholic patient with 
out-dated treatment and inappropriate use of antabuse. 
 
On February 7, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that Dr. Lo shall: 
 
1.    undergo, at his own expense, a re-assessment of his practice within 12 months which 
      shall include a review of his documentation and record-keeping, his appropriate 
      prescription and monitoring of Lithium in clinical practice, his communications with 
      family members and family physicians, and his identification and referral to specialists of 
      patients in his care with comorbid alcoholism;  
2.    abide by all recommendations provided by the Assessor; 
3.    attend for a reprimand on a date to be fixed within 3 months; and 
4.    pay costs of $3,650 to the College within 30 days 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Fe1-5,9-11,Ap22,23,Jn14-17,Se27-30,2010,Fe7-8,2011

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 3, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hung-Tat Lo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 3, 2016:

Dr. Lo was the subject of an assessment of his practice. As a result of the assessment, Dr. Lo’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of the Individualized Education Plan.