Lo, Jason Hang-Tat (CPSO#: 72360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
3000 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 6E1
Phone: (905) 480-1050
Fax: (905) 480-0898
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo ( CPSO# 72360 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
3000 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 6E1
Phone Number: (905) 480-1050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON HANG-TAT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2000