Lo, Jeremy Che Kit (CPSO#: 62521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71B WILLOW STREET
Ottawa ON  K1R 6V9
Phone: (613) 238-6818
Fax: (613) 238-1638
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo ( CPSO# 62521 )

Business Address:
71B Willow Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 6V9
Phone Number: (613) 238-6818

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY CHE KIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991