Lo, Karen Ka-Wing (CPSO#: 68834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C/O McGARRELL PLACE NH
355 McGarrell Drive
London ON  N6G 0B1
Phone: (519) 672-0500
Fax: (519) 472-7987
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C/O CHELSEY PARK NH, 3rd Floor
310 OXFORD ST WEST
London ON  N6H 4N6
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1855 Ext. 239
Fax: (519) 679-7324
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas W.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tam ( CPSO# 66508 )
Dr. K. Lo ( CPSO# 68834 )

Business Address:
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-1900


Corporation Name: Karen Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lo ( CPSO# 68834 )

Business Address:
C/O McGarrell Place NH
355 McGarrell Drive
London ON  N6G 0B1
Phone Number: (519) 672-0500

Business Address:
C/O Chelsey Park NH
3rd Floor
310 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 4N6
Phone Number: (519) 432-1855

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN KA-WING LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997