Lo, Lydia Ching Luen (CPSO#: 63775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: (613) 498-0444
Fax: (613) 498-4850
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Au & Dr. Lydia Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lo ( CPSO# 63775 )
Dr. A. Au ( CPSO# 68837 )

Business Address:
60 California Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 5W1
Phone Number: (613) 498-5900

Business Address:
Procter & Gamble Inc
1475 California Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 6K4
Phone Number: (613) 342-9592

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
106 - 100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone Number: (613) 498-0444

Business Address:
Invista Canada Health Centre
1400 County Road # 2E
Maitland ON  K0E 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 348-4225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYDIA CHING LUEN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992