Lo, Patrick Chi Chiu (CPSO#: 62654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4047
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Radiology Associates Dundix
Suite 302
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-3369
Fax: (416) 231-4103
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Young ( CPSO# 62476 )
Dr. P. Lo ( CPSO# 62654 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
North York Medical Arts Building
330 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7533

Business Address:
Radiology Asociates Etobicoke
LF01
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-3961

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Dundix
Suite 302
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (416) 231-3369

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Clarkson
1020 Johnson's Lane
Building C
Mississauga ON  L5J 2P7

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Mississauga
402 - 3025 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Rexdale
6 - 123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK CHI CHIU LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991