Lo, Ronnie Yu Kit (CPSO#: 62519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 3H4
Phone: (905) 427-7767
Fax: (905) 427-4339
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ron Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 62519 )

Business Address:
North Ajax Medical Clinic
475 Westney Road North
Ajax ON  L1T 3H4
Phone Number: (905) 427-7767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 2, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ronnie Yu Kit Lo in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lo to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                           ("Undertaking") 
                                                  of
                                            DR. RONNIE LO 
                                              ("Dr. Lo")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the
                  Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the ControlledDrugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the
                  Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lo, certificate of registration number 62519, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that the College received information from the NMS
                  initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215598 into whether I
                  failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or am
                  incompetent in my prescribing of controlled substances, including
                  narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that if an original copy of this Undertaking as
                  signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Lo, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N);
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Lo's signature;
                  
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out below); and
                  
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.

            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision
                        for a minimum of four (4) weeks on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to review every patient with
                        my Clinical Supervisor(s) prior to issuing a continuing
                        prescription for any Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                        Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and
                        All other Monitored Drugs to ensure that assessment, clinical
                        examination, risk assessment for addiction and on-going management
                        and follow up is appropriate.
                  
                  (e)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Lo, undertake not to initiate any new
                        prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs to any patient who is not currently prescribed the
                        medication in question by me, unless recommended by my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (f)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to ensure that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) directly observes at least three (3) patient
                        encounters per week where I issue a prescription for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                        Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs.
                  
                  (g)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to ensure that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) confirms his or her review of my patient care with me
                        as described in (8)(d) and (e) above by signing the Prescribing Log
                        and the patient chart in question prior to my issuing any
                        prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                        Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two weeks.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4) weeks of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
             Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (j)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision
                        for a minimum of eight (8) weeks on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (k)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every week to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 20 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                  
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                  
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                  
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two weeks.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that after a minimum of eight (8) weeks of
                        Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
             Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")

                  (o)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of nine (9) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (p)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Lo, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                  
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                  
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                  
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that after a minimum of nine (9) months of
                        Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills   and   judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical 5 Supervisor(s) may
                         recommend to the College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical Supervision
                        will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        and approval by the College.
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        undated report of the medical inspector received by the College on
                        June 14, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within fourteen (14)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (aa)  I, Dr. Lo, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (8)(y) and/or (z)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (bb)  I, Dr. Lo, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (8)(aa) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Lo, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                        in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                        workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                                    Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-
                                    articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                              4.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-
                                    Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp
                  
                                    (iii) Enroll in and successfully complete the
                                          University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                                          in Medical Record Keeping:
                                          http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                                    (iv)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                                          the CPSO Policy
                                          "MedicalRecords":http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
                                          Publications/Policy/Medical-Records; and
                  
                                    (v)   any additional professional education recommended
                                          by my Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful
                  completion of each element of the Professional Education specified above,
                  including proof of registration, attendance and participant assessment
                  reports where available, within one (1) month of completion of each
                  element. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                  discretion, whether I have successfully completed each element of the
                  Professional Education.

            (d)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the
                  College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional
                  Education.

            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        Clinical Supervision set out under section 8 of the Undertaking has
                        ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include
                        a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview of me,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.
                   (e)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be
                        provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing  this  Undertaking. Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing
                        practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

             (15) I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lo, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with the section above, the following summary
                        shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring
                        System about Dr. Lo's prescribing of controlled substances,
                        including narcotics.
                  
                        Based on the information received, the College conducted
                        investigations into whether Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard
                        of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his
                        prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a
                        result of  the investigation:
                  
                        "Dr. Lo's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations,
                        controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances,
                        and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of twelve (12)
                        months.
                  
                        "Dr. Lo will engage in professional education in the prescribing of
                        controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                        "Following the professional education and period of supervision,
                        Dr. Lo's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics,
                        will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.
                  
             D.   CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Lo, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ronnie Yu Kit Lo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 2, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Lo’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Lo failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Lo’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Lo will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Lo’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)