Lo, Shirley May Ho May (CPSO#: 64955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street South
Suite 302
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 684-9237
Fax: (905) 684-4178
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Lo & A. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lo ( CPSO# 64955 )
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 60901 )

Business Address:
302 - 180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 684-9237

Business Address:
10 - 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 788-1711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIRLEY MAY HO MAY LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993