Lo Stracco, Robert (CPSO#: 69337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 Eramosa Road
Guelph ON  N1E 2M4
Phone: (519) 821-1507
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT LO STRACCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO STRACCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997