Lo, Wai-Keung Alex (CPSO#: 33486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Veteran's Affairs Canada
Billing's Bridge Tower
2nd Floor
2323 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0P5
Phone: (613) 998-1221
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 Terminal Ave
Unit 22B
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Lo ( CPSO# 33486 )

Business Address:
Unit 22B
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI-KEUNG ALEX LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1984