Lo, Yin Tsun Lawrence (CPSO#: 50942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Newport Center Drive
Suite 301
Newport Beach CA  92660
United States
Phone: (949) 644-1300
Fax: (949) 644-1306

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIN TSUN LAWRENCE LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1991