Loan, Paul Brereton (CPSO#: 69744)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996