Loba Gutierrez, Georges (CPSO#: 88469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Brussels, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PARKWOOD INSTITUTE
550 Wellington Road
G5
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC
800 COMMISSIONERS RD EAST
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 6858500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGES LOBA GUTIERREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBA GUTIERREZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013