Loblaw, Douglas Andrew Burr (CPSO#: 68860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 Finch Ave W
3rd Floor
North York ON  M2R1N5
Canada
Phone: 4166352491
Fax: 4166352499
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Loblaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Loblaw ( CPSO# 68860 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
T-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4806

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 635-2491

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS ANDREW BURR LOBLAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBLAW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000