Lobo, Andrea Natalie (CPSO#: 73952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
455 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 2A9
Phone: (416) 869-3627
Fax: (416) 703-3962
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 1A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 961-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lobo ( CPSO# 73952 )

Business Address:
455 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 2A9
Phone Number: (416) 869-3627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA NATALIE LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001