Lobo, Deepika Delilah (CPSO#: 101249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
McMaster University
Suite 2006
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22356
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPIKA DELILAH LOBO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LOBO is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. LOBO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LOBO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LOBO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LOBO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LOBO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 26 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 26 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 26 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018