Lobo, Francesca Veronica Olindo (CPSO#: 28752)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013