Lobo, Joel Jude Anthony (CPSO#: 71433)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 426-5460
Fax: (905) 426-6667
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Ctr
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 967-8699
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lobo ( CPSO# 71433 )

Business Address:
200 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 426-5460

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL JUDE ANTHONY LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002