Lobo, Kevin Anthony (CPSO#: 62282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar
Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4601
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Hospital Campus
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007


Corporation Name: Kevin Lobo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lobo ( CPSO# 62282 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4601

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
137 Cairncroft
Oakville ON  L6J 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 842-7021

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ANTHONY LOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991