Lock, Joyce (CPSO#: 52631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1230 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G9
Phone: (519) 631-9900 Ext. 1255
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE LOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986