Locke, Kenneth Andrew (CPSO#: 68116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1650
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 549-1674
Fax: (855) 591-7179
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K A Locke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 9 2017


Corporation Name: K A Locke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Locke ( CPSO# 68116 )

Business Address:
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 549-1674

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 549-1674

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 549-1674

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 549-1674

Business Address:
Suite 1650
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 549-1674

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ANDREW LOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998