Locke, Kirsty Catherine Isabel Amanda (CPSO#: 98393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTY CATHERINE ISABEL AMANDA LOCKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017