Lockhat, Abdoola Mahomed (CPSO#: 23358)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2015