Lockington, Kathryn Mary (CPSO#: 57195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
540 Armstrong Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Phone: (613) 507-5400
Fax: (613) 507-7398
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn Lockington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Dr. K. Lockington ( CPSO# 57195 )

Business Address:
540 - B Armstrong Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Phone Number: (613) 507-5400

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KATHRYN MARY LOCKINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCKINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988