Lodha, Vinay (CPSO#: 76513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6905
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tailor ( CPSO# 80880 )
Dr. V. Lodha ( CPSO# 76513 )

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2V 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINAY LODHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 11 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2002 to 11 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006