Lodhen, Tenzin (CPSO#: 85383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1408 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6K1L9
Phone: 4165328277
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T Lodhen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lodhen ( CPSO# 85383 )

Business Address:
98 Nordin Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 2B3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TENZIN LODHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008