Loeb, Mark Bertram (CPSO#: 62299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
MDCL 3200
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 26679
Fax: (905) 389-5822
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK BERTRAM LOEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1991