Loewy, John Allan (CPSO#: 31455)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loewy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2007


Corporation Name: John Loewy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2013