Lofsky, Stanley (CPSO#: 20779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Clovercrest Road
Willowdale ON  M2J 1Z6
Phone: (647) 692-0556
Fax: (416) 493-2125
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2901 Bayview Avenue
P. O, Box 91130
Toronto Ontario
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 416-834-0475
Fax: 416-981-7878
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanley Lofsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lofsky ( CPSO# 20779 )

Business Address:
28 Clovercrest Road
Toronto ON  M2J 1Z6
Phone Number: (416) 493-2639

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 20 Dec 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY LOFSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOFSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967