Lofters, Wycliffe Shakespeare (CPSO#: 46377)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Jamaican Creole

Education:University of the West Indies, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1971 to 30 Jun 1972
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 3 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012