Loftus, Philip John Anthony (CPSO#: 21340)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1991