Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Logan, Cecile Angela Maureen (CPSO#: 58616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of the West Indies, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
116 boul Lionel- Emond
Gatineau
QC
Hull Gatineau QC  J8Y 1W7
Phone: (819) 966-6038
Fax: 819 966 6076

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECILE ANGELA MAUREEN LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2000