Logan, David Alexander (CPSO#: 24405)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Jan 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013