Logan, Louise Carmen (CPSO#: 71686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls, Ontario
P2B 2Y6
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Toner and Dr. Louise Logan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Logan ( CPSO# 71686 )
Dr. L. Toner ( CPSO# 72427 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
N. Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone Number: (705) 662-7215

Business Address:
West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
2120 Regent Street South
Unit 3
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 523-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE CARMEN LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1999