Logan, Vance Michael (CPSO#: 58449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
421 Eglinton Ave. West
Unit 1
Toronto ON  M5N 1A4
Phone: (416) 968-0660
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANCE MICHAEL LOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988