Loganathan, Rajeswary (CPSO#: 70454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7475 McCowan Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J6
Phone: (905) 944-0100
Fax: (905) 944-8599
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJESWARY LOGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998