Logarakis, Nick Frank (CPSO#: 69214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 316
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-8897
Fax: (416) 439-6128
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescent Town Specialty Clinic
4 The Market Place, Crescent Town
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-1357
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nick Frank Logarakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Logarakis ( CPSO# 69214 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Suite 316
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8897

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICK FRANK LOGARAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGARAKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000