Logsetty, Sarvesh (CPSO#: 62680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: 204-787-7638

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Manitoba
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARVESH LOGSETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGSETTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991