Lok, Charmaine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 68901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
8 North Wing - 844
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4140
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charmaine E. Lok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lok ( CPSO# 68901 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 8N - 844
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARMAINE ELIZABETH LOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1999