Lok, Tsun-Ki (CPSO#: 50947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inverness Consolidated Memorial
Hospital
39 James Street
Inverness NS  B0E 1N0
Phone: (902) 258-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TSUN-KI LOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016