Loke, Julian Chen Phai (CPSO#: 67033)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 May 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013