Lokhat, Mohammad Hossen (CPSO#: 21686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As from March 12, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohammad Hossen
            Lokhat in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lokhat to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Lokhat has ceased practising medicine until such time as he has
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
            (2 of 2)
            As from February 12, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohammad Hossen
            Lokhat in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lokhat to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                      DR. MOHAMMAD HOSSEN LOKHAT
                                            ("Dr. Lokhat")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lokhat, certificate of registration number 21686, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective 
                  immediately.
                  
            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least ten (10) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").  Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval
                        from the College.
                  
                  Phase 1 - High Level Supervision
                  
                  i)    For a minimum of four (4) weeks, I will practise only under
                        high-level supervision, with the Clinical Supervisor on the
                        premises at all times who would be the most responsible physician
                        for all patient care. During this period, the Clinical Supervisor
                        must be available in person at all times to review treatment plans
                        and the Clinical Supervisor will sign all patient charts and
                        approve of all treatment plans by the end of the day in which the
                        patient attended the office. 
                  
                  ii)   The Clinical Supervisor will conduct chart reviews, have
                        discussions with and directly observe me in practice during two (2)
                        half-day office sessions per week.
                  
                  iii)  The Clinical Supervisor will submit a report to the College on a
                        bi-weekly basis.  Such report(s) which will include commentary on
                        the recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor and my response
                        to the recommendations.  The first report will include commentary
                        on the four (4) half-day sessions of observation.
                  
                  iv)   After a minimum of four (4) weeks, if the Clinical Supervisor
                        recommends and the College approves, I will transition to moderate
                        level supervision.
                  
                  Phase 2 - Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                  v)    After a minimum of four (4) weeks of high level supervision, if the
                        Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves, I will
                        practise under moderate level supervision. The moderate level
                        supervision will last for a minimum of twelve (12) weeks.
                  
                  vi)   The Clinical Supervisor and I will meet once per week and will
                        review a minimum of fifteen (15) charts per week to assess the
                        quality of documentation and the care and treatment provided to my
                        patients.  
                  
                  vii)  The Clinical Supervisor will submit a report to the College on a
                        monthly basis which will include commentary on the recommendations
                        made by the Clinical Supervisor and my response to the
                        recommendations.
                  
                  viii) The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                        reviewed along with patient identifiers.
                  
                  ix)   After a minimum of twelve (12) weeks, if the Clinical Supervisor
                        recommends and the College approves, I will transition to low level
                        supervision.
                  Phase 3 - Low Level Supervision
                  
                  x)    After a minimum of twelve (12) weeks of moderate level supervision,
                        if the Clinical Supervisor recommends and the College approves, I
                        will practise under low level supervision.  The low level
                        supervision will last for a minimum of six (6) months.
                  
                  xi)   The Clinical Supervisor will review a minimum of fifteen (15)
                        charts per month to assess the quality of documentation and the
                        care and treatment provided to my patients.
                  
                  xii)  The Clinical Supervisor will submit a report to the College once
                        every three (3) months which will include commentary on the
                        recommendations made by the Clinical Supervisor and my response to
                        the recommendations.
                  
                  xiii) The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                        reviewed along with patient identifiers.
                  
            (b)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's
                  undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is
                  required of the Clinical Supervisor(s), including reports to the College.

            (c)   I, Dr. Lokhat, shall fully cooperate with the education facilitated by
                  the Clinical Supervisor as set out in this Undertaking and Appendix "A"
                  attached, and to abide by any recommendations of my Clinical
                  Supervisor(s), including but not limited to any recommended practice
                  improvements and any recommendations that I participate in further
                  educational opportunities.

            (d)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by
                  the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in
                  the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas
                  of concern identified in the two assessment reports of the assessor and
                  concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

            (e)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that in making its determination that I may
                  return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I sign a
                  further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and limitations on my
                  certificate of registration or requiring ongoing re-assessments, clinical
                  supervision and/or monitoring. 

            (f)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking
                  is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the
                  date I execute this Undertaking.

            (g)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in
                  Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to
                  fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time.

            (h)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                  Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (g) above, including
                  returning a signed Appendix "A" within twenty (20) days, I will cease
                  practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical
                  Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

            (i)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a
                  result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or
                  limitation on my certificate of registration and said term, condition or
                  limitation will be included on the public register.

            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    primary care (e.g., Pri-Med Canada); and
                              2.    medical record keeping;
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to complete the two courses specified in
                        section 6(a)(i) above within six (6) months of the date I execute
                        this Undertaking  or, if no satisfactory program is available by
                        that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the Professional
                        Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and Appendix "B"
                        attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (the
                        "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review of a minimum of twenty-five (25) charts,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of the Assessor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the
                        results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to
                        the College and the report may form the basis of further action by
                        the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Lokhat, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lokhat, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (9)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Lokhat's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
                  
                                    "Dr. Lokhat will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a
                                    minimum of ten months. 
                  
                                    "Dr. Lokhat will engage in professional education in
                                    primary care and medical record keeping.
                  
                                    "Dr. Lokhat's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within three months of
                                    the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Lokhat, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Lokhat, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C".

            (18)  I, Dr. Lokhat, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Lokhat, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Lokhat, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate my completion
                  of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohammad Hossen Lokhat to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 12, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Lokhat’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Lokhat will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of ten months.

Dr. Lokhat will engage in professional education in primary care and medical record keeping.

Dr. Lokhat’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.