Lokoff, Paul Christopher (CPSO#: 53957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hosptial
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4261 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 513-7722
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Boxgrove Medical Arts Centre
Suite 300
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7128
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M5K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul C. Lokoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lokoff ( CPSO# 53957 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7074

Business Address:
4261 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3R 9W6
Phone Number: (905) 513-7722

Business Address:
379 Church Street
5th Floor
Markham ON  L6B 0T1

Business Address:
300 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 472-7121

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2H 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER LOKOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOKOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1985